THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:11:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Hospital
Room A10-227
339 Windermere Road
P.O.Box 5339
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3976
Fax: (519) 663-2907

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karim Qumosani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Qumosani (CPSO#: 84148 ) Dr. A. Kashgari (CPSO#: 84142 )
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8094
Business Address: University Hospital
Suite A 10-227
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3976

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Hospital
Room A10-227
339 Windermere Road
P.O.Box 5339
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3976
Fax: (519) 663-2907

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karim Qumosani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Qumosani (CPSO#: 84148 ) Dr. A. Kashgari (CPSO#: 84142 )
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8094
Business Address: University Hospital
Suite A 10-227
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3976

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIM MOHAMMED YOUSEF QUMOSANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUMOSANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIM MOHAMMED YOUSEF QUMOSANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUMOSANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2006