THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:51:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: Hawass, Ammar Nour-El-Din (Used Until: 22 Jul 2009)
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-500 King St W
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 579-3444
Fax: (905) 576-7980
Address: 312 Queen St East.
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
Phone: 905-458-7377
Fax: 905-458-7477
Address: 6400 Millcreek Dr., Unit 9
Mississauga Ontario L5N 3E7
Phone: 905-288-1045
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 105-2295 Bristol Circle
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
Phone: (647) 540-4025
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Markham Rd #425
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3C3
Phone: 416-438-7080
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Hawass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hawass (CPSO#: 84162 )
Business Address: 2-500 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K9
(905) 579-3444
Business Address: 2295 Bristol Circle
Suite 105
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
(416) 918-4004
Business Address: Suite 9
6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 3E7
(905) 858-1368

General Information

Former Name: Hawass, Ammar Nour-El-Din (Used Until: 22 Jul 2009)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-500 King St W
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 579-3444
Fax: (905) 576-7980
Address: 312 Queen St East.
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
Phone: 905-458-7377
Fax: 905-458-7477
Address: 6400 Millcreek Dr., Unit 9
Mississauga Ontario L5N 3E7
Phone: 905-288-1045
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 105-2295 Bristol Circle
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
Phone: (647) 540-4025
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Markham Rd #425
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3C3
Phone: 416-438-7080
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Hawass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hawass (CPSO#: 84162 )
Business Address: 2-500 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K9
(905) 579-3444
Business Address: 2295 Bristol Circle
Suite 105
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
(416) 918-4004
Business Address: Suite 9
6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 3E7
(905) 858-1368

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK AMMAR HAWASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWASS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK AMMAR HAWASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWASS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2006
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2006