THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:43:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, KANNADA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road, Unit W1212
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 73542
Fax: (613) 737-8715
Address: 350 John St N
Arnprior Ontario K7S2P6
Phone: 613-623-3166
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2649 Concession Rd
2675
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Phone: 613-258-3435
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 73542
Fax: 613-737-8715
Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 73542
Fax: 613-737-8715

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjay Murthy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Murthy (CPSO#: 84169 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 73542
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Suite W1212
Box 255
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 73542
Business Address: 350 John St N
Arnprior ON K7S 2P6
Business Address: 312 Pleasant Park Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 5M8
Business Address: 2649 Concession Rd
Street # is 2675 (not 2649)
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, KANNADA
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road, Unit W1212
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 73542
Fax: (613) 737-8715
Address: 350 John St N
Arnprior Ontario K7S2P6
Phone: 613-623-3166
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2649 Concession Rd
2675
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Phone: 613-258-3435
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 73542
Fax: 613-737-8715
Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 73542
Fax: 613-737-8715

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjay Murthy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Murthy (CPSO#: 84169 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 73542
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Suite W1212
Box 255
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 73542
Business Address: 350 John St N
Arnprior ON K7S 2P6
Business Address: 312 Pleasant Park Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 5M8
Business Address: 2649 Concession Rd
Street # is 2675 (not 2649)
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJAY KRISHNA MURTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJAY KRISHNA MURTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2006