THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:43:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne St W
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053253969
Fax: 7054180312
Address: 38 Maple Dr
Orillia ON L3V 3W2
Phone: 7053253969
Fax: 7054180312

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Bailey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bailey (CPSO#: 84216 )
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne St W
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053253969
Fax: 7054180312
Address: 38 Maple Dr
Orillia ON L3V 3W2
Phone: 7053253969
Fax: 7054180312

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Bailey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bailey (CPSO#: 84216 )
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK NORMAN BAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK NORMAN BAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006