THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:40:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 222-3737
Fax: (705) 222-4259
Address: unit 202-1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3A 1Y8
Phone: (705) 222-8889
Fax: 705-524-5501 ·
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Health Sciences North
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1485 Bancroft Dr
Sudbury Ontario P3B1R6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Sep 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tara-Anne Baldisera, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Baldisera (CPSO#: 84217 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 2120 Regent Street South
Unit 5
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
(705) 222-3737
Business Address: 202-1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3A 1Y8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 222-3737
Fax: (705) 222-4259
Address: unit 202-1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3A 1Y8
Phone: (705) 222-8889
Fax: 705-524-5501 ·
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Health Sciences North
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1485 Bancroft Dr
Sudbury Ontario P3B1R6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Sep 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tara-Anne Baldisera, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Baldisera (CPSO#: 84217 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 2120 Regent Street South
Unit 5
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
(705) 222-3737
Business Address: 202-1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3A 1Y8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA-ANNE BALDISERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALDISERA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA-ANNE BALDISERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALDISERA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006