THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:31:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1105 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-8700
Fax: (613) 724-6264
Address: Riverside Hospital
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University of Ottawa Eye Inst
The Ottawa Hospital - General
Critical Care Wing - 3rd Floor
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8575
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Baryla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baryla (CPSO#: 84218 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1105 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-8700
Fax: (613) 724-6264
Address: Riverside Hospital
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University of Ottawa Eye Inst
The Ottawa Hospital - General
Critical Care Wing - 3rd Floor
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8575
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Baryla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baryla (CPSO#: 84218 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA GRAZYNA BARYLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARYLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA GRAZYNA BARYLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARYLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006