THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:12:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Port Dover Doctor's Office
North Shore Centre
3- 697 Highway 6
Unit 3
Port Dover Ontario N0A 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 583-0893
Fax: 519-583-0010

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Hadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hadi (CPSO#: 84220 )
Business Address: 3 - 697 Highway 6
P O Box 728
Port Dover Ontario N0A 1N0
(519) 583-0893

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Port Dover Doctor's Office
North Shore Centre
3- 697 Highway 6
Unit 3
Port Dover Ontario N0A 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 583-0893
Fax: 519-583-0010

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Hadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hadi (CPSO#: 84220 )
Business Address: 3 - 697 Highway 6
P O Box 728
Port Dover Ontario N0A 1N0
(519) 583-0893

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006