THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:10:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street, Rm B2-047
London, ON
N6A 4V
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 66065
Fax: 519-646-6119

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 07 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Clinical Pharmacology
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Clinical Pharmacology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Constance A. Mackenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mackenzie (CPSO#: 84222 )
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6065

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street, Rm B2-047
London, ON
N6A 4V
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 66065
Fax: 519-646-6119

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 07 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Clinical Pharmacology
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Clinical Pharmacology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Constance A. Mackenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mackenzie (CPSO#: 84222 )
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6065

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CONSTANCE ALEXA MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CONSTANCE ALEXA MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006