THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 530 Fred st, unit E
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 239-2165
Fax: (613) 239-2167

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Naciuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Naciuk (CPSO#: 84223 )
Business Address: Unit E
530 Fred Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 239-2165

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 530 Fred st, unit E
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 239-2165
Fax: (613) 239-2167

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Naciuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Naciuk (CPSO#: 84223 )
Business Address: Unit E
530 Fred Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 239-2165

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY EDITH NACIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NACIUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY EDITH NACIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NACIUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006