THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:20:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Extension: 4315
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Sambasivan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sambasivan (CPSO#: 82724 ) Dr. N. Dust (CPSO#: 84232 )
Business Address: Monfort Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621 Extn: 6233

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Dust Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sambasivan (CPSO#: 82724 ) Dr. N. Dust (CPSO#: 84232 )
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621 Extn: 4315

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Extension: 4315
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Sambasivan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sambasivan (CPSO#: 82724 ) Dr. N. Dust (CPSO#: 84232 )
Business Address: Monfort Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621 Extn: 6233

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Dust Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sambasivan (CPSO#: 82724 ) Dr. N. Dust (CPSO#: 84232 )
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621 Extn: 4315

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS LORNE DROUIN DUST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS LORNE DROUIN DUST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006