THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:42:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: Foong, Natalie Yee Mun (Used Until: 27 Jul 2011)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 633-9292
Fax: (519) 633-9413

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reddy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Reddy (CPSO#: 84245 ) Dr. R. Reddy (CPSO#: 84302 )
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2020
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3

General Information

Former Name: Foong, Natalie Yee Mun (Used Until: 27 Jul 2011)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 633-9292
Fax: (519) 633-9413

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reddy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Reddy (CPSO#: 84245 ) Dr. R. Reddy (CPSO#: 84302 )
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2020
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE YEE MUN REDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE YEE MUN REDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006