THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5292 Yonge St
HealthOne Medical Centre
North York ON M2N 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-223-6666
Fax: 416-223-5335
Address: Health One Medical Centre
5292 Yonge Street
North York Ontario M2N 5P9
Phone: (416) 223-6666
Fax: (416) 223-5335
Address: 301 High Tech Rd
Richmond Hill Medical and After Hours Clinic
Richmond Hill ON L4B 4R2
Phone: 905-709-4274
Fax: 905-709-4985

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victor Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ng (CPSO#: 84249 )
Business Address: 5292 Yonge Street
North York Ontario M2N 5P9
(416) 223-6666
Business Address: Richmond Hill Medical and After Hours Clinic
301 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 4R2
(905) 709-4274

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5292 Yonge St
HealthOne Medical Centre
North York ON M2N 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-223-6666
Fax: 416-223-5335
Address: Health One Medical Centre
5292 Yonge Street
North York Ontario M2N 5P9
Phone: (416) 223-6666
Fax: (416) 223-5335
Address: 301 High Tech Rd
Richmond Hill Medical and After Hours Clinic
Richmond Hill ON L4B 4R2
Phone: 905-709-4274
Fax: 905-709-4985

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victor Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ng (CPSO#: 84249 )
Business Address: 5292 Yonge Street
North York Ontario M2N 5P9
(416) 223-6666
Business Address: Richmond Hill Medical and After Hours Clinic
301 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 4R2
(905) 709-4274

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTOR KENG WAI NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTOR KENG WAI NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006