THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:44:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Emergency Department
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-1661
Extension: 52289
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Emergency Department
Windsor Ontario N9A 1H9
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shaw (CPSO#: 84255 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Emergency Department
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-1661 Extn: 52289

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Emergency Department
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-1661
Extension: 52289
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Emergency Department
Windsor Ontario N9A 1H9
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shaw (CPSO#: 84255 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Emergency Department
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-1661 Extn: 52289

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW FRANCIS SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW FRANCIS SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006