THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:27:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Dr
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 853-2212
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Manji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Manji (CPSO#: 84260 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Dr
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 853-2212
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Manji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Manji (CPSO#: 84260 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIF MANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIF MANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006