THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:11:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
St. Catharines General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1200 Fourth Ave.
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 45000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James M. Beecroft Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Beecroft (CPSO#: 84263 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647 Extn: 45000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
St. Catharines General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1200 Fourth Ave.
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 45000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James M. Beecroft Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Beecroft (CPSO#: 84263 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647 Extn: 45000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES MICHAEL BEECROFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEECROFT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES MICHAEL BEECROFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEECROFT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006