THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:32:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 770 Mohawk Road West
Hamilton Ontario L9C 1X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 526-9661
Fax: (905) 523-1583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Morry Black Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Black (CPSO#: 84265 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 770 Mohawk Road West
Hamilton Ontario L9C 1X9
(905) 626-9661

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 770 Mohawk Road West
Hamilton Ontario L9C 1X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 526-9661
Fax: (905) 523-1583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Morry Black Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Black (CPSO#: 84265 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 770 Mohawk Road West
Hamilton Ontario L9C 1X9
(905) 626-9661

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MORRY PHILLIP BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MORRY PHILLIP BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006