THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:43:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 94 Stuart St
Room 2067 Etherington Hall
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 533-6604
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clements-Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Clements-Baker (CPSO#: 84270 )
Business Address: 94 Stuart Street
Etherington Hall Room 2067
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-6604
Business Address: 401 - 98 Bally Street
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
(905) 427-2678

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 94 Stuart St
Room 2067 Etherington Hall
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 533-6604
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clements-Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Clements-Baker (CPSO#: 84270 )
Business Address: 94 Stuart Street
Etherington Hall Room 2067
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-6604
Business Address: 401 - 98 Bally Street
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
(905) 427-2678

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE ISOBEL CLEMENTS-BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMENTS-BAKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE ISOBEL CLEMENTS-BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMENTS-BAKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006