THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:34:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-2319 Fairview St
Burlington, ON
L7R 2E3
Burlington Ontario L7R 2E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 635-3632
Fax: (905) 336-9220

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Jerome Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jerome (CPSO#: 84284 )
Business Address: 602-2319
Fairview St
Burlington ON L7R 2E3
905-635-3632

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-2319 Fairview St
Burlington, ON
L7R 2E3
Burlington Ontario L7R 2E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 635-3632
Fax: (905) 336-9220

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Jerome Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jerome (CPSO#: 84284 )
Business Address: 602-2319
Fairview St
Burlington ON L7R 2E3
905-635-3632

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA LEE JEROME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEROME is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA LEE JEROME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEROME is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006