THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:33:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 106
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 729-7352
Fax: (613) 722-1310
Address: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hisham Khalil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khalil (CPSO#: 84286 )
Business Address: Suite 106
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
(613) 729-7352

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 106
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 729-7352
Fax: (613) 722-1310
Address: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hisham Khalil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khalil (CPSO#: 84286 )
Business Address: Suite 106
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
(613) 729-7352

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HISHAM ABRAHAM DANIEL KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HISHAM ABRAHAM DANIEL KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006