THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:14:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Room 1NE- 126
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6151
Fax: (416) 756-6735

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meeta Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patel (CPSO#: 84294 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1NE-126
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6165

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Room 1NE- 126
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6151
Fax: (416) 756-6735

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meeta Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patel (CPSO#: 84294 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1NE-126
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6165

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEETA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEETA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006