THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:39:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department Of Nephrology
3rd Floor Marian, M318
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33542
Fax: (905) 521-6153

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen To Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. To (CPSO#: 84296 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
M318-50 Charlton Avenue East
3rd Floor Marian Wing
Department of Nephrology
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 33542
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrance Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department Of Nephrology
3rd Floor Marian, M318
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33542
Fax: (905) 521-6153

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen To Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. To (CPSO#: 84296 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
M318-50 Charlton Avenue East
3rd Floor Marian Wing
Department of Nephrology
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 33542
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrance Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN CHIA-YING TO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN CHIA-YING TO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006