THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:00:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9 Elgin Street East
Unit 6B
Cobourg Ontario K9A 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 373-1280
Fax: (905) 373-9335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rina Daskalopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Daskalopoulos (CPSO#: 84299 )
Business Address: 6B-9 Elgin Street East
Cobourg Ontario K9A 0A1
(905) 373-1280

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9 Elgin Street East
Unit 6B
Cobourg Ontario K9A 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 373-1280
Fax: (905) 373-9335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rina Daskalopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Daskalopoulos (CPSO#: 84299 )
Business Address: 6B-9 Elgin Street East
Cobourg Ontario K9A 0A1
(905) 373-1280

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RINA DASKALOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASKALOPOULOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RINA DASKALOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASKALOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006