THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:05:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
St Michaels Hospital
7th Fl, Donnelly Wing
Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5905
Fax: (416) 864-5566
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Cardiology
Cardiac Catheterization Lab
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Greater Sudbury
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 7055237100
Extension: 3940
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. M. Al Nasser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Sep 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
St Michaels Hospital
7th Fl, Donnelly Wing
Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5905
Fax: (416) 864-5566
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Cardiology
Cardiac Catheterization Lab
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Greater Sudbury
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 7055237100
Extension: 3940
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. M. Al Nasser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Sep 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMI MOHAMMED A ALNASSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNASSER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMI MOHAMMED A ALNASSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNASSER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 May 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2006