THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:39:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 410
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-856-9933
Fax: 905-901-5550
Address: 30 Bond Street
8 Cardinal Carter North, ENT Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-5276
Fax: 416-864-5694
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Elm Wing 6183
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: 416 813-6558
Fax: 416 813-5036

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Holler (CPSO#: 84323 ) Dr. O. Ayeni (CPSO#: 77457 )
Business Address: McMaster University
Medical Centre
4E15 - 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 300 Hospital Gate Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 410
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-856-9933
Fax: 905-901-5550
Address: 30 Bond Street
8 Cardinal Carter North, ENT Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-5276
Fax: 416-864-5694
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Elm Wing 6183
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: 416 813-6558
Fax: 416 813-5036

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Holler (CPSO#: 84323 ) Dr. O. Ayeni (CPSO#: 77457 )
Business Address: McMaster University
Medical Centre
4E15 - 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 300 Hospital Gate Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THERESA ANNE MARIE HOLLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THERESA ANNE MARIE HOLLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006