THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:07:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
835 King Street West
PO Box 9056
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4380
Extension: 5489
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 740-4940
Extension: 2340
Fax: (519) 740-7722

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joda Kuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kuk (CPSO#: 84326 )
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2333
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4380

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
835 King Street West
PO Box 9056
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4380
Extension: 5489
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 740-4940
Extension: 2340
Fax: (519) 740-7722

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joda Kuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kuk (CPSO#: 84326 )
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2333
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4380

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODA STANLEY KUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODA STANLEY KUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006