THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:15:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300-5
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-849-4567
Extension: 552
Fax: 905-815-8883
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North Oakville Medical Centre
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 409
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 849-4567
Extension: 552
Fax: (905) 815-8883

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Qin Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Li (CPSO#: 84330 )
Business Address: Suite 300-5
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W7
(905) 849-4567 Extn: 552

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300-5
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-849-4567
Extension: 552
Fax: 905-815-8883
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North Oakville Medical Centre
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 409
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 849-4567
Extension: 552
Fax: (905) 815-8883

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Qin Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Li (CPSO#: 84330 )
Business Address: Suite 300-5
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W7
(905) 849-4567 Extn: 552

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QIN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QIN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006