THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:41:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C110 - 2230 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke Ontario M8V 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 748-9444
Fax: (647) 748-9344

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carlos A. Lopez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lopez (CPSO#: 84331 )
Business Address: C110 - 2230 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke Ontario M8V 0B2
(647) 748-9444
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
(647) 748-9444

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C110 - 2230 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke Ontario M8V 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 748-9444
Fax: (647) 748-9344

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carlos A. Lopez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lopez (CPSO#: 84331 )
Business Address: C110 - 2230 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke Ontario M8V 0B2
(647) 748-9444
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
(647) 748-9444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLOS ANDRES LOPEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLOS ANDRES LOPEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006