THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 201-3416
Fax: (905) 472-9797

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kersti Ranken Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ranken (CPSO#: 84339 )
Business Address: 5th Floor
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
(905) 201-3416
Business Address: 306 Copper Creek Dr
Markham ON L6B 1N8
905-201-3416

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 201-3416
Fax: (905) 472-9797

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kersti Ranken Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ranken (CPSO#: 84339 )
Business Address: 5th Floor
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
(905) 201-3416
Business Address: 306 Copper Creek Dr
Markham ON L6B 1N8
905-201-3416

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KERSTI ANNE RANKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANKEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KERSTI ANNE RANKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANKEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006