THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:26:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2600 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1T 2M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 830 0911
Fax: 416 830 3392
Address: 2600 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1T 2M5
Phone: 416 830 0911
Fax: 416 830 3392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 22 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Annesse Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lee (CPSO#: 84345 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: 3833 Midland Ave
Unit G
Scarborough ON M1V 5L6
416 830 0911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2600 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1T 2M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 830 0911
Fax: 416 830 3392
Address: 2600 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1T 2M5
Phone: 416 830 0911
Fax: 416 830 3392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 22 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Annesse Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lee (CPSO#: 84345 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: 3833 Midland Ave
Unit G
Scarborough ON M1V 5L6
416 830 0911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNESSE YOOMEE LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNESSE YOOMEE LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006