THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:55:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Building
Suite 2-003, Box 10
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4707
Fax: (416) 586-8489

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Steiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Steiman (CPSO#: 84363 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph And Wolfe Lebovic Building
Suite 2 - 223, Box 10
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 4707

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Building
Suite 2-003, Box 10
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4707
Fax: (416) 586-8489

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Steiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Steiman (CPSO#: 84363 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph And Wolfe Lebovic Building
Suite 2 - 223, Box 10
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 4707

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA JOIE STEIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA JOIE STEIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006