THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:24:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Sreet
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5585
Fax: (519) 751-5588
Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bryan C. W. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lee (CPSO#: 84370 )
Business Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 387-9495
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5585

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Sreet
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5585
Fax: (519) 751-5588
Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bryan C. W. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lee (CPSO#: 84370 )
Business Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 387-9495
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5585

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYAN CHEK WEI LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYAN CHEK WEI LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006