THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:30:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Main Street Markham North
Markham Ontario L3P 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-5022
Fax: (905) 471-1878
Address: Mon Sheong LTC Centre
11199 Yonge St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1L2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Universal Care LTC Centre
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Francesca Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Cheung (CPSO#: 84371 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2442
Business Address: Mon Sheong Richmond Hill Long Term Care Centre
11199 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1L2
(905) 883-9288
Business Address: 25 Main Street North
Markham Ontario L3P 1X3
(905) 471-5022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Main Street Markham North
Markham Ontario L3P 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-5022
Fax: (905) 471-1878
Address: Mon Sheong LTC Centre
11199 Yonge St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1L2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Universal Care LTC Centre
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Francesca Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Cheung (CPSO#: 84371 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2442
Business Address: Mon Sheong Richmond Hill Long Term Care Centre
11199 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1L2
(905) 883-9288
Business Address: 25 Main Street North
Markham Ontario L3P 1X3
(905) 471-5022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCESCA TING YAN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCESCA TING YAN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006