THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:58:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Rosemount Avenue Suite 401
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 728-0088
Fax: (613) 728-8787

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Silvana Bolano Del Vecchio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bolano Del Vecchio (CPSO#: 84379 )
Business Address: 11 Rosemount Avenue
Suite 401
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4R8
(613) 728-0088
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Rosemount Avenue Suite 401
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 728-0088
Fax: (613) 728-8787

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Silvana Bolano Del Vecchio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bolano Del Vecchio (CPSO#: 84379 )
Business Address: 11 Rosemount Avenue
Suite 401
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4R8
(613) 728-0088
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SILVANA MARGARITA BOLANO DEL VECCHIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLANO DEL VECCHIO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SILVANA MARGARITA BOLANO DEL VECCHIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLANO DEL VECCHIO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006