THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:14:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: Devitt, Deanna Lee (Used Until: 11 Feb 2010)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7350
Extension: 75595
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 19 Dec 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Quon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Quon (CPSO#: 84382 ) Dr. M. Quon (CPSO#: 84397 )
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
(613) 756-3044
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 744-2422
Business Address: 350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
(613) 623-3166
Business Address: 451 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M5
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
(613) 256-2500
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
(613) 737-7350 Extn: 75595

General Information

Former Name: Devitt, Deanna Lee (Used Until: 11 Feb 2010)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7350
Extension: 75595
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 19 Dec 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Quon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Quon (CPSO#: 84382 ) Dr. M. Quon (CPSO#: 84397 )
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
(613) 756-3044
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 744-2422
Business Address: 350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
(613) 623-3166
Business Address: 451 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M5
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
(613) 256-2500
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
(613) 737-7350 Extn: 75595

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEANNA LEE QUON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEANNA LEE QUON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006