THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:12:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Causley St
Blind River Ontario P0R1B0
Phone: 7053562265
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jay Labbe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Labbe (CPSO#: 84389 )
Business Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Causley St
Blind River Ontario P0R1B0
Phone: 7053562265
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jay Labbe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Labbe (CPSO#: 84389 )
Business Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAY CAMERON LABBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAY CAMERON LABBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006