THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:27:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite B05
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164318224
Fax: 4164398625

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moussa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moussa (CPSO#: 84396 )
Business Address: 3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Building A-2nd Floor
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V1
(416) 431-8224

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite B05
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164318224
Fax: 4164398625

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moussa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moussa (CPSO#: 84396 )
Business Address: 3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Building A-2nd Floor
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V1
(416) 431-8224

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAFFY CESARIO MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAFFY CESARIO MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006