THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:31:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-3635 Rivergate Way
Riverside Court Medical Clinic
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-739-3700
Fax: 613-739-9845

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Strike Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Strike (CPSO#: 84403 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-3635 Rivergate Way
Riverside Court Medical Clinic
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-739-3700
Fax: 613-739-9845

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Strike Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Strike (CPSO#: 84403 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA SARAH STRIKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRIKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA SARAH STRIKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRIKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006