THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:38:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Manor Long Term Care Home
525 Main Street North
Brampton Ontario L6X 3C8
Phone: (905) 453-4140
Fax: (905) 861-9140
Address: Thrive Integrated Care
Seniors Health and Wellness Village at Peel Manor
525 Main Street North
Brampton Ontario L6X 3C8
Phone: 905-791-7800
Extension: 1691
Fax: 289-720-2654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Chin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chin (CPSO#: 84410 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Corporation Name: Peter Man Cho Chin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Manor Long Term Care Home
525 Main Street North
Brampton Ontario L6X 3C8
Phone: (905) 453-4140
Fax: (905) 861-9140
Address: Thrive Integrated Care
Seniors Health and Wellness Village at Peel Manor
525 Main Street North
Brampton Ontario L6X 3C8
Phone: 905-791-7800
Extension: 1691
Fax: 289-720-2654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Chin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chin (CPSO#: 84410 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Corporation Name: Peter Man Cho Chin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN CHIU HON CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN CHIU HON CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006