THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:17:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)837-6440
Extension: 2210
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Delhi St
Homewood Health Centre
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Cockburn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cockburn (CPSO#: 84411 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 821-9260

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)837-6440
Extension: 2210
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Delhi St
Homewood Health Centre
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Cockburn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cockburn (CPSO#: 84411 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 821-9260

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCAS CHARLES COCKBURN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COCKBURN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCAS CHARLES COCKBURN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COCKBURN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006