THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:46:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2J 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-644-9877
Fax: 613-440-3238
Address: Suite 206
435 Reynolds St.
Oakville Ontario L6J 3M5
Phone: 877-789-4247
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Huber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Huber (CPSO#: 84424 )
Business Address: 206-435 Reynolds St
Oakville ON L6J 3M5
Business Address: 560-1145 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 0Y3

Corporation Name: Jonathan Huber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2022

Corporation Name: Huber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2J 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-644-9877
Fax: 613-440-3238
Address: Suite 206
435 Reynolds St.
Oakville Ontario L6J 3M5
Phone: 877-789-4247
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Huber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Huber (CPSO#: 84424 )
Business Address: 206-435 Reynolds St
Oakville ON L6J 3M5
Business Address: 560-1145 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 0Y3

Corporation Name: Jonathan Huber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2022

Corporation Name: Huber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN DAVID HUBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUBER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN DAVID HUBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUBER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006