THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:06:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Science Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road, Room E1-102
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 76538
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Hames Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hames (CPSO#: 84430 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: LHSC
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Science Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road, Room E1-102
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 76538
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Hames Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hames (CPSO#: 84430 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: LHSC
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH HAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH HAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006