THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:25:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 4th ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-682-6451
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrian Ishkanian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ishkanian (CPSO#: 84460 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 4th ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-682-6451
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrian Ishkanian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ishkanian (CPSO#: 84460 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIAN SHEA ISHKANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISHKANIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIAN SHEA ISHKANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISHKANIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006