THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:27:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
S107
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-7654
Extension: 402045
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.L. Bouchard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bouchard (CPSO#: 84461 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
S107-555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7654 Extn: 224525

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
S107
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-7654
Extension: 402045
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.L. Bouchard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bouchard (CPSO#: 84461 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
S107-555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7654 Extn: 224525

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYSE LORRAINE BOUCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYSE LORRAINE BOUCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006