THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:16:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Primrose Family Medicine Centre
35 Primrose Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1R 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 230-7788
Fax: (613) 230-7778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rangwala Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rangwala (CPSO#: 84468 ) Dr. C. Fung (CPSO#: 84465 )
Business Address: Primrose Family Medicine Centre
35 Primrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1R 1A0
(613) 230-7788
Business Address: St. Patrick Nursing Home
2865 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8N5
(613) 731-4660
Business Address: 225 Scholastic Dr
Greystone Transitional Care Unit
Ottawa ON K1S 5W2
613-787-8251

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Primrose Family Medicine Centre
35 Primrose Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1R 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 230-7788
Fax: (613) 230-7778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rangwala Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rangwala (CPSO#: 84468 ) Dr. C. Fung (CPSO#: 84465 )
Business Address: Primrose Family Medicine Centre
35 Primrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1R 1A0
(613) 230-7788
Business Address: St. Patrick Nursing Home
2865 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8N5
(613) 731-4660
Business Address: 225 Scholastic Dr
Greystone Transitional Care Unit
Ottawa ON K1S 5W2
613-787-8251

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOHIL RANGWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANGWALA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOHIL RANGWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANGWALA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006