THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:45:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ridi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ridi (CPSO#: 84478 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Victory 7
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ridi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ridi (CPSO#: 84478 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Victory 7
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACY RIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACY RIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006