THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:56:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Humber River Hospital
Schulich Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Toronto Ontario M3M 3G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1008
Fax: 416-242-1082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. C.G. WILSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wilson (CPSO#: 84480 )
Business Address: 797 Princess Street
Suite 105
Kingston Ontario K7L 1G1
6134534180

Corporation Name: Banh and Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Humber River Hospital
Schulich Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Toronto Ontario M3M 3G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1008
Fax: 416-242-1082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. C.G. WILSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wilson (CPSO#: 84480 )
Business Address: 797 Princess Street
Suite 105
Kingston Ontario K7L 1G1
6134534180

Corporation Name: Banh and Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLIN GRAHAM WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLIN GRAHAM WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Dec 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006