THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:49:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: Perry, Christie Lynn (Used Until: 27 Jul 2008)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 990 GAINSBOROUGH RD
London Ontario N6H 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 601-8621
Fax: (519) 204-3122

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TALLEVI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tallevi (CPSO#: 84496 )
Business Address: 990 Gainsborough Rd
London ON N6H 5L4
5196018621
Business Address: 5196018621

General Information

Former Name: Perry, Christie Lynn (Used Until: 27 Jul 2008)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 990 GAINSBOROUGH RD
London Ontario N6H 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 601-8621
Fax: (519) 204-3122

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TALLEVI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tallevi (CPSO#: 84496 )
Business Address: 990 Gainsborough Rd
London ON N6H 5L4
5196018621
Business Address: 5196018621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIE LYNN TALLEVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALLEVI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIE LYNN TALLEVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALLEVI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006