THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:03:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 482-3000
Fax: (519) 482-7648

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Seevaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Seevaratnam (CPSO#: 84497 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 482-3000
Fax: (519) 482-7648

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Seevaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Seevaratnam (CPSO#: 84497 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORETTA SEEVARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEEVARATNAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORETTA SEEVARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEEVARATNAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006