THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:34:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207-435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197441167
Extension: 3
Fax: 519-744-1168

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.S.Baath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Baath (CPSO#: 84506 )
Business Address: Suite 225
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 2C3
(705) 450-0100
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434
Business Address: 207-435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207-435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197441167
Extension: 3
Fax: 519-744-1168

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.S.Baath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Baath (CPSO#: 84506 )
Business Address: Suite 225
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 2C3
(705) 450-0100
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434
Business Address: 207-435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KULRAJBIR SINGH BAATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAATH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KULRAJBIR SINGH BAATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAATH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006