THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:30:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Prime Care FHT
Suite 206
470 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-6793
Fax: (905) 878-6711

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexandra Yudin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yudin (CPSO#: 84512 )
Business Address: Prime Care FHT
206 - 470 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2J4
(905) 878-6793

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Prime Care FHT
Suite 206
470 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-6793
Fax: (905) 878-6711

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexandra Yudin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yudin (CPSO#: 84512 )
Business Address: Prime Care FHT
206 - 470 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2J4
(905) 878-6793

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA YUDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUDIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA YUDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUDIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 May 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006